Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Oguki-Atakpah

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Atakpamé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1919BornAtakpamé
14 Jan 195132.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 196445.7AppointedBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
3 Dec 196445.8Ordained BishopBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
10 Apr 197657.2ResignedBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
26 Feb 197758.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Atakpamé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Bernard Oguki-Atakpah:
Bishop Bernard Oguki-Atakpah (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Atakpamé

  • a priest for 26.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013