Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Ralph Cotey, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nachingwea, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1921Born
7 Jun 194927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
5 Aug 196342.1AppointedBishop of Nachingwea, Tanzania
20 Oct 196342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nachingwea, Tanzania
11 Nov 198362.4ResignedBishop of Nachingwea, Tanzania
21 May 199876.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nachingwea, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Arnold Ralph Cotey
Bishop Arnold Ralph Cotey S.D.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nachingwea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilwaukee, WI, USA

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast