Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Agcaoili Jose

Bishop of Urdaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1950 BornLaoag City
29 Jun 197524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Laoag, Philippines
21 Sep 200554.8AppointedBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines
26 Nov 200555.0Ordained BishopBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines
30 Dec 200555.1InstalledBishop of Urdaneta, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Agcaoili Jose:
Bishop Jacinto Agcaoili Jose (born ) Bishop of Urdaneta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Urdaneta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015