Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alberto Fernández Alara

Bishop of Rafaela, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1946 Born
29 Jun 197528.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
24 Jan 200962.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
24 Jan 200962.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpi
27 Mar 200962.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpi
10 Sep 201366.8AppointedBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
22 Nov 201367.0InstalledBishop of Rafaela, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Alberto Fernández Alara
Bishop Luis Alberto Fernández Alara (born ) Bishop of Rafaela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLomas di Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rafaela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,081
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Sep 2013
  • i: CB, 25 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jun 2017