Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Sousa Braga, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1941 BornSanto Espirito
27 May 197029.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
9 Apr 199655.0AppointedBishop of Angra, Portugal
30 Jun 199655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
15 Mar 201675.0RetiredBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António de Sousa Braga
Bishop António de Sousa Braga S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Angra

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Angra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,767
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016