Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Enrici

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Ancusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1909Born
29 Jun 193324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cuneo, Italy
17 Sep 195546.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancusa
17 Sep 195546.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Indonesia
1 Nov 195546.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancusa
30 Jan 195848.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
5 Jan 196050.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Japan
1 Oct 196253.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Australia
26 Apr 196960.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Great Britain
16 Jul 197364.2AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
1 Dec 197970.6ResignedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
3 Dec 199788.6DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Domenico Enrici
Archbishop Domenico Enrici (born , died ) Official Emeritus of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervasca San Stefano, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy
Ordained PriestSanta Maria del Bosco, Cathedral, Cuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCervasca, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cervasca San Stefano, Cemetery, Cuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 100
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 151
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast