Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Gristina

Archbishop of Catania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1946 BornSciara
17 May 197023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
16 Jul 199246.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palermo, Italy
16 Jul 199246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
3 Oct 199246.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
23 Jan 199952.6AppointedBishop of Acireale, Italy
20 Mar 199952.7InstalledBishop of Acireale, Italy
7 Jun 200256.0AppointedArchbishop of Catania, Italy
6 Aug 200256.1InstalledArchbishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Gristina:
Archbishop Salvatore Gristina (born ) Archbishop of Catania

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Catania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,927
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013