Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clemens P. Chabukasansha

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kasama, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1917Born
29 Aug 194831.4Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 196346.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Rosebery, Zambia
13 Sep 196346.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibyra
20 Oct 196346.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibyra
6 Jul 196548.2AppointedBishop of Kasama, Zambia
12 Jun 196750.2AppointedArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia
22 Feb 197355.9ResignedArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia
13 Aug 198063.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kasama, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Clemens P. Chabukasansha
Archbishop Clemens P. Chabukasansha (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kasama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChabukasansha's Village

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast