Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lyon

Archidioecesis Lugdunensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Philippe Xavier Ignace Barbarin, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Patrick Le Gal, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 15 December 2006
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 5,087 (1,964 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-lyon.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: 1 Place de Fourviere, 69321 Lyon CEDEX 05, France
  • Telephone: 4.72.38.80.90
  • Fax: 4.78.36.06.00

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lyon
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Lyon (erected)
Archdiocese of Lyon
3rd CenturyElevatedDiocese of Lyon Archdiocese of Lyon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Belley (suppressed) Archdiocese of Lyon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Mâcon (suppressed) Diocese of Autun
Archdiocese of Lyon
6 October 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Lyon Diocese of Belley
Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
6 October 1822Name ChangedArchdiocese of Lyon Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
26 December 1970Territory LostArchdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne) Diocese of Saint-Etienne (erected)
Archdiocese of Lyon
15 December 2006Name ChangedArchdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne) Archdiocese of Lyon

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
19701,700,0002,020,03684.2%1,3635001,86391229804,600743ap1971
19801,298,0001,679,00077.3%8373791,2161,06756763,676522ap1981
19901,200,0001,630,00073.6%6524001,0521,140226792,859516ap1991
19991,224,0001,750,00069.9%5173859021,356407762,090486ap2000
20001,200,0001,725,30069.6%5003858851,355444092,090514ap2001
20011,200,0001,725,30069.6%4933858781,366463992,090514ap2002
20021,200,0001,733,50069.2%450955452,201481082,090189ap2003
20031,200,0001,733,50069.2%484935772,079501062,090175ap2004
20041,200,0001,735,00069.2%4701005702,105511142,090160ap2005
Archdiocese of Lyon

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014