Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie François Rousset, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1921BornGrièges
24 Feb 194523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
24 Jan 196644.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
24 Jan 196644.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimma
6 Mar 196644.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimma
23 Feb 197149.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
28 Sep 198766.0ResignedBishop of Saint-Etienne, France
9 Jan 201694.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie François Rousset:
Bishop Paul-Marie François Rousset Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Etienne

  • a priest for 70.8 years
  • a bishop for 49.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 11 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 12 Jan 2016