Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine de Malvin de Montazet

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1713BornQuissac
18 Mar 174834.6SelectedBishop of Autun, France
15 Jul 174834.9ConfirmedBishop of Autun, France
18 Aug 174835.0Ordained BishopBishop of Autun, France
16 Mar 175844.6SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
18 Jul 175844.9ResignedBishop of Autun, France
2 Aug 175845.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
2 May 178874.7DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Malvin de Montazet:
Archbishop Antoine de Malvin de Montazet (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 67, and Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013