Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Jacques-Maurice Cardinal de Bonald

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1787BornMillau
22 Feb 181224.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182335.3SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
10 Mar 182335.4ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
27 Apr 182335.5Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
11 Dec 183952.1SelectedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
27 Apr 184052.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
1 Mar 184153.3Elevated to Cardinal
1 Mar 184153.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
25 Feb 187082.3DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jacques-Maurice de Bonald:
Cardinal Louis-Jacques-Maurice de Bonald (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
  • a cardinal for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 77, and Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013