Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Marie-Joseph-Eusèbe Cardinal Caverot

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1806Born
19 Mar 183124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
26 Mar 184942.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
20 Apr 184942.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
22 Jul 184943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
27 Apr 187669.9SelectedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
26 Jul 187670.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
12 Mar 187770.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 187771.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
24 Mar 188477.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
23 Jan 188780.6DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie-Joseph-Eusèbe Caverot (VIAF: 12302812)
Louis-Marie-Joseph-Eusèbe Cardinal Caverot (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoinville, Diocese of Langres
Ordained BishopCathedral, Besançon, Archdiocese of Besançon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 241, and Page 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 52, and Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 41
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017