Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Jean Dechelette

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1848Born
1873¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Feb 190657.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Feb 190657.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
25 Mar 190657.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
7 Feb 191364.4AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
11 Apr 192071.6DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jean Dechelette
Bishop Louis-Jean Dechelette (born , died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontmagny

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast