Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre-Guérin Cardinal de Tencin

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1680BornGrenoble
12 Jun 172443.8AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
2 Jul 172443.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
23 Feb 173958.5Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 173958.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
11 Nov 174060.2AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
2 Mar 175877.5DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Guérin de Tencin:
Cardinal Pierre-Guérin de Tencin (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1739
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013