Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Maistret, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Titular Bishop of Damascus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1534¹Born
17 Nov 157440.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
17 Nov 157440.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Damascus
27 Dec 157440.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Damascus
6 Jun 161581.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Maistret (VIAF: 316669663)
Bishop Jacques Maistret O. Carm. (born 1534, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuilly, Cote d'Or
Ordained BishopAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon
Death PlaceAix les Bains, Savoie

  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 185
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018