Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph Cuaz, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laos

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Parva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1862Born
27 Sep 188522.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 May 189936.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Laos
12 May 189936.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Parva
3 Sep 189936.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Parva
26 Aug 191249.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Laos
16 Nov 195087.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laos

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph Cuaz (VIAF: 198766561)
Bishop Marie-Joseph Cuaz M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Laos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained BishopBangkok

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 51.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017