Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Besançon

Archidioecesis Bisuntinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4th Century
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 9,732 (3,758 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-besancon.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 3 rue de la Convention, 25041 Besancon CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.81.82.60.20
  • Fax: 3.81.82.60.35

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Besançon
2nd CenturyErectedDiocese of Besançon (erected)
Archdiocese of Besançon
4th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Besançon Archdiocese of Besançon
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Claude (suppressed) Archdiocese of Besançon
6 October 1822Territory LostArchdiocese of Besançon Diocese of Saint-Claude
3 November 1979Territory LostArchdiocese of Besançon Diocese of Belfort-Montbéliard (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Besançon
1950565,000574,00098.4%943651,0085601881,678892ap1951
1959730,000760,00096.1%1,040951,1356431572,014902ap1960
1970740,000782,87994.5%82450874846501,750885ap1971
1980475,500501,45094.8%60833641741861,297748ap1981
1990503,000528,00095.3%459304891,028481913770ap1991
1999500,000535,00093.5%326133391,474166071076ap2000
2000510,000550,41292.7%318113291,550165868576ap2001
2001512,000550,41293.0%310113211,595195667267ap2002
2002500,000552,79390.4%299123111,607196063867ap2003
2003500,000550,41290.8%285112961,689195560667ap2004
2004500,000550,41290.8%266122781,798215459767ap2005
2006500,000550,00090.9%25082581,937245056567ap2007
2012533,000583,72991.3%202132152,479294641567ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 5 Jan 2014