Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Brunon, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1913BornMarlhes
11 Jun 193825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
12 Mar 196552.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne-Saint Bertrand de Comminges-Rieux), France
12 Mar 196552.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagal
27 May 196552.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagal
9 Jul 196653.4AppointedSuperior General of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
4 Apr 197057.1AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
Jul 197259.3ResignedSuperior General of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
28 Apr 198471.2ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
27 Jun 199784.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Brunon:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Brunon P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013