Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Clément Cardinal Villecourt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1787BornLyon
21 Dec 181124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon, France
183244.2IncardinatedPriest of Sens (-Auxerre), France
30 Oct 183548.1SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
1 Feb 183648.3ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
13 Mar 183648.4Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
17 Dec 185568.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Dec 185568.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
7 Mar 185668.4ResignedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
17 Jan 186779.3DiedBishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Clément Villecourt:
Cardinal Clément Villecourt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
  • a cardinal for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013