Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Louis Vial

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1906BornLyon
15 Jun 193529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
8 Feb 196154.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nevers, France
8 Feb 196154.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agnus
15 Apr 196155.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agnus
17 Dec 196357.7SucceededBishop of Nevers, France
2 Jul 196660.3AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
15 Apr 198276.1RetiredBishop of Nantes, France
5 Jun 199589.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Michel-Louis Vial:
Bishop Michel-Louis Vial (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nantes

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013