Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Xavier Christian Ignace Marie Cardinal Barbarin

Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1950 Born
6 Jun 197625.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Créteil, France
17 Dec 197727.1Ordained PriestPriest of Créteil, France
1 Oct 199847.9AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
22 Nov 199848.0Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
16 Jul 200251.7AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
14 Sep 200251.9InstalledArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Oct 200353.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200353.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
7 Feb 200453.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
6 Mar 202069.3ResignedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Xavier Christian Ignace Marie Barbarin (VIAF: 100443115)
Philippe Xavier Christian Ignace Marie Cardinal Barbarin (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRabat, Vicariate Apostolic of Rabat, Morocco
Ordained DeaconSaint-Saturnin, Church, Nogent-sur-Marne, Diocese of Créteil
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Church, Alfortville, Diocese of Créteil
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l'Annonciation, Cathedral Basilica, Moulins, Diocese of Moulins

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Lyon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,448
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2020
  • c1/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast