Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel-Maurice-Augustin-Marie Darmancier, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1918Born
10 Feb 194627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
22 Dec 196143.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
22 Dec 196143.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
26 Apr 196243.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus
21 Jun 196647.8AppointedBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
25 Apr 197455.6ResignedBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
1 Oct 198466.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Michel-Maurice-Augustin-Marie Darmancier
Bishop Michel-Maurice-Augustin-Marie Darmancier S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIzieux, France

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018