Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Chatagnon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1839Born
185919.8ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Dec 186223.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
25 Jan 188747.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China
25 Jan 188747.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
24 Apr 188748.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chersonesus in Creta
26 Nov 192081.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Marc Chatagnon
Bishop Marc Chatagnon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCellieu, Archdiocese of Lyon, France
Ordained BishopSuifu
Death PlaceSuifu

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 199
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,887, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast