Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Jacques Marie Desfarges, S.J.

Archbishop of Alger, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1944 Born
8 May 197531.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
14 Jun 197531.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
30 Apr 198136.9Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Nov 200864.5AppointedBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
12 Feb 200964.7Ordained BishopBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
20 Feb 200964.7InstalledBishop of Constantine (-Hippone), Algeria
23 May 201571.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alger, Algeria
24 Dec 201672.6AppointedArchbishop of Alger, Algeria
10 Feb 201772.7InstalledArchbishop of Alger, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Paul Jacques Marie Desfarges (VIAF: 191916958)
Archbishop Paul Jacques Marie Desfarges S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained DeaconSt-Ignace, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSt-Ignace, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame d`Afrique, Basilica, Alger, Archdiocese of Alger

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Alger.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2008
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,053
  • ab: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2015, Number 10
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2016
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 13 Sep 2018

Quantcast