Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Bertrand Chagué

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1920BornDijon
17 Mar 194524.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 196948.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
2 Jul 196948.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vico Equense
20 Sep 196949.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vico Equense
18 Jan 197554.5AppointedBishop of Gap, France
1 Oct 198060.2DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Bertrand Chagué:
Bishop Pierre Bertrand Chagué (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013