Catholic-Hierarchy DC

François-Auguste-Ferdinand Cardinal Donnet

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1795BornBourg-Argental
7 Mar 181923.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 183539.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
6 Apr 183539.3ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
6 Apr 183539.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
31 May 183539.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
30 Dec 183641.1SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
19 May 183741.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
15 Mar 185256.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 185357.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
23 Dec 188287.1DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for François-Auguste-Ferdinand Donnet (VIAF: 182379)
François-Auguste-Ferdinand Cardinal Donnet (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
  • a cardinal for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 121, and Page 275
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 323
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016