Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Bron

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Titular Bishop of Aegae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1711Born
14 Jan 175442.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
14 Jan 175442.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegae
24 Feb 175442.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegae
31 Oct 177462.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Marie Bron
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Marie Bron (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 67, and Page 452
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast