Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice Marcel Gardès

Archbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1945 Born
22 Jun 197530.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Dec 200459.8AppointedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
6 Feb 200560.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
22 Oct 202075.7RetiredArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France

MicroData Summary for Maurice Marcel Gardès
Archbishop Maurice Marcel Gardès (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained PriestSaint-Laurent, Church, Sathonay-Camp, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie, Cathedral, Auch, Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,823
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2020
  • opd/c1: AJ, 29 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast