Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Epalle, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Melanesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Sion

Vicar Apostolic of Micronesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1808Born
1837²28.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Jul 1838³30.3ProfessedPriest of Society of Mary
19 Jul 184436.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Melanesia, Pacific (Oceania)
19 Jul 184436.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sion
19 Jul 184436.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Jul 184436.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sion
19 Dec 184537.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Melanesia, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Epalle
Bishop Jean Baptiste Epalle S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Melanesia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarlhes, France

  • a priest for 8.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 347
  • opd/prof: CB, 11 Mar 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast