Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Navarre

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Titular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1683Born
Dec 1708³25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon, France
25 May 173551.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
25 May 173551.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
10 Jul 173551.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
25 Sep 175369.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Navarre
Bishop Nicolas Navarre (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2019

Quantcast