Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude de Bellièvre

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576²BornLyon
1 Oct 160428.7AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
12 Dec 160428.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
26 Apr 161236.3DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Bellièvre:
Archbishop Claude de Bellièvre (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015