Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles d’Alecon, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jun 1365AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
13 Jul 1365Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
5 Jul 1375DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Charles d’Alecon
Archbishop Charles d’Alecon O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

  • a bishop for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 316
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast