Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Marius Laval

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1854Born
10 Nov 187723.1Ordained PriestPriest of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
7 Sep 191156.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA
7 Sep 191156.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
29 Nov 191157.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
4 Jun 193782.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Marius Laval
Bishop John Marius Laval (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New Orleans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne, France

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast