Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Delay

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

Titular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1879Born
5 Oct 190222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
10 Aug 192848.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
10 Aug 192848.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
29 Oct 192848.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
14 Aug 193757.6AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
31 Jan 194868.1AppointedArchbishop of Marseille, France
5 Sep 195676.7RetiredArchbishop of Marseille, France
5 Sep 195676.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pompeiopolis in Paphlagonia
6 Dec 196686.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Delay
Archbishop Jean Delay (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorette

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017