Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Spada

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1597BornLyon, France
3 Aug 164345.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
23 Aug 164346.0Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
2 Mar 165456.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165456.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
27 Jan 165961.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
25 Sep 167376.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
23 Jan 167577.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Spada:
Cardinal Giambattista Spada (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
  • a cardinal for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1654
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 162

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013