Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie Mioland

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1788BornLyon
14 Jun 181223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
22 Dec 183749.2SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
12 Feb 183849.3ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
22 Apr 183849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
7 Feb 184960.3SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
2 Apr 184960.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
2 Apr 184960.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
29 Sep 185162.9SucceededArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
16 Jul 185970.7DiedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Mioland:
Archbishop Jean-Marie Mioland (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 501, and Page 551
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013