Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Le Gal

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

Titular Bishop of Arisitum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1953 BornErmont
21 Mar 198229.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Dec 198229.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 199744.7AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
7 Dec 199744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
23 May 200047.4AppointedBishop of France, Military
7 Oct 200956.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
7 Oct 200956.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arisitum

MicroData Summary for Patrick Le Gal:
Bishop Patrick Le Gal (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Lyon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,173
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013