Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonin Guillermain, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale}, Uganda

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1861Born
23 Sep 188726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
12 Jan 189534.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale}, Uganda
12 Jan 189534.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
28 Oct 189534.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
14 Jul 189635.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale}, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Antonin Guillermain
Bishop Antonin Guillermain M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained BishopRubaga

  • a priest for 8.8 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast