Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hyacinthe-Jean Chassagnon

Deceased

Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1864BornBas-en-Basset
15 Jun 188925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
28 Jun 191753.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
28 Jun 191753.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
10 Oct 191753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modra
19 Jun 192258.4AppointedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
22 Aug 192258.5InstalledBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
12 Feb 194076.0DiedBishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe-Jean Chassagnon:
Bishop Hyacinthe-Jean Chassagnon (born , died ) Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon)

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013