Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Geoffroy Vassal

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1439AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
20 Apr 1444AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
16 Oct 1446DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy Vassal
Archbishop Geoffroy Vassal (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 267, and Page 182

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast