Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Benoît Chouzy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kuamsi, China

Titular Bishop of Petnelissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1837Born
1859¹21.8ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Jun 186023.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Aug 189154.4AppointedPrefect of Kuamsi, China
21 Aug 189154.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Petnelissus
22 Nov 189154.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Petnelissus
22 Sep 189962.5DiedPrefect of Kuamsi, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Benoît Chouzy
Bishop Jean-Benoît Chouzy M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Kuamsi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanissières, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne), France
Ordained BishopHong Kong

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast