Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thierry Marie Jacques Brac de la Perričre

Bishop of Nevers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1959 Born
19 Jun 198829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lyon (-Vienne), France
15 Apr 200343.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
15 Apr 200343.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
25 May 200343.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata
27 Aug 201152.1AppointedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Thierry Marie Jacques Brac de la Perričre (VIAF: 327333)
Bishop Thierry Marie Jacques Brac de la Perričre (born ) Bishop of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nevers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast