Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Marie Cardinal Billé

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1938Born
25 Mar 196224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Luçon, France
10 Mar 198446.0AppointedBishop of Laval, France
19 May 198446.2Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
5 May 199557.2AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
10 Jul 199860.3AppointedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
21 Feb 200163.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200163.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
22 Jul 200163.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
12 Mar 200264.0DiedArchbishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Billé (VIAF: 14890579)
Louis-Marie Cardinal Billé (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon (-Vienne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFleury-lès-Aubrais, Diocese of Orléans
Ordained PriestLuçon, Diocese of Luçon
Ordained BishopSalle des Fêtes, Laval, Diocese of Laval
Death PlaceSister's house, Talence, Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas)
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 85, Number 7,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast