Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guy Cardinal de Boulogne

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1313¹BornBoulogne, France
11 Oct 134027.8AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
20 Sep 134229.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
20 Sep 134229.7Elevated to Cardinal
135037.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
135138.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
25 Nov 137360.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guy de Boulogne:
Cardinal Guy de Boulogne (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a cardinal for 31.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013