Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-François Pompallier, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Auckland

Titular Archbishop of Amasea

Titular Bishop of Maronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1801BornLyons, France
13 Jun 182927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
13 May 183634.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Oceania
13 May 183634.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
30 Jun 183634.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
184240.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of New Zealand
3 Jul 184846.6AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
Feb 1869³67.1ResignedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
19 Apr 186967.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
21 Dec 187170.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Auckland, New Zealand

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-François Pompallier:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-François Pompallier S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Auckland

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013