Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marius-Félix-Antoine Maziers

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux (-Bazas)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1915BornSiran
9 Oct 193823.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 195944.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
17 Dec 195944.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
25 Feb 196044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
24 Jan 196650.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
24 Jan 196650.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zica
5 Feb 196852.9SucceededArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
31 May 198974.2RetiredArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
14 Aug 200893.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

MicroData Summary for Marius-Félix-Antoine Maziers:
Archbishop Marius-Félix-Antoine Maziers (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 11
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Mar 2015