Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Louis Perrichon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Malacca, Singapore

Titular Bishop of Corone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1872Born
21 Sep 189523.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Aug 192048.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Malacca, Singapore
23 Aug 192048.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Corone
27 Nov 192149.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corone
11 Aug 193260.1DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Malacca, Singapore

MicroData Summary for Pierre Louis Perrichon
Bishop Pierre Louis Perrichon M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Malacca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarajasse, France

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast