Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)

Dioecesis Valentinensis (-Diensis-Tricastinensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Pierre-Yves Michel, Bishop
  • Didier-Léon Marchand, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 12 June 1911
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lyon
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 6,522 (2,519 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centre-Est
  • Official Web Site: http://catholique-valence.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Maison Diocesaine du Bon Pasteur, 11 rue du Clos-Gaillard, B.P. 825, 26008 Valence CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 4.75.81.77.07
  • Fax: 4.75.81.77.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Valence
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Valence (erected)
Diocese of Valence and Die
1275UnitedDiocese of Die
Diocese of Valence
Diocese of Valence and Die
1678SplitDiocese of Valence and Die Diocese of Die
Diocese of Valence
Diocese of Valence
1678SplitDiocese of Valence and Die Diocese of Die
Diocese of Valence
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux (suppressed) Diocese of Avignon
Diocese of Valence
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Vienne (suppressed) Diocese of Grenoble
Diocese of Valence
Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)
12 June 1911Name ChangedDiocese of Valence Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux) (from Avignon)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Valence (-Die-Saint-Paul-Trois-Châteaux)
1950250,842268,23393.5%40990499502175877246ap1951
1970300,000341,94587.7%31890408735139810250ap1971
1980315,000367,00085.8%25884342921162585250ap1981
1990326,000402,80080.9%188802681,2164160465244ap1991
1999250,000414,07260.4%143501931,2951772180173ap2000
2000381,000436,50087.3%138231612,3661963207135ap2001
2001350,000436,50080.2%133451781,9662285207126ap2002
2002340,000436,50077.9%122241462,3282410021423ap2003
2003340,000436,50077.9%112241362,5002410021423ap2004
2004340,000436,50077.9%103241272,6772412224323ap2005
2010283,081486,01958.2%93921851,5303516320622ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014