Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Regis Granjon

Deceased

Bishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1863Born
17 Dec 188724.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 190036.8AppointedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
17 Jun 190037.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
9 Nov 192259.4DiedBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Regis Granjon
Bishop Henry Regis Granjon (born , died ) Bishop of Tucson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Etienne, France

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast